PREM KUMAR AGARWAL
-
About PREM KUMAR AGARWAL,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U51909WB2009PTC138815 AVIGHNA VYAPAR PRIVATE LIMITED 4061000.0 Active 20/10/2015 - U52100WB2010PTC150100 SHREEPATIH DEALCOM PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 31/05/2010 - U52100WB2010PTC150103 SURSUNDARI MARKETING PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 31/05/2010 - U52100WB2010PTC150104 SURUCHIH DEALTRADE PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 31/05/2010 - U52100WB2010PTC150105 SUKHADAH COMMOSALES PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 31/05/2010 - U52100WB2010PTC150106 SUPARNAH DEALTRADE PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 31/05/2010 - U52100WB2017PLC220318 ADHVIK SUPPLIERS LIMITED 500000.0 Active 28/03/2017 - U52190WB2010PTC149944 STUTIH VINTRADE PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 28/05/2010 - U52397WB2017PLC220382 VAISHAVI TRADERS LIMITED 500000.0 Active 30/03/2017 - U52601WB2017PLC220379 SAKSHAM SUPPLIERS LIMITED 500000.0 Active 30/03/2017 - U52609WB2016PLC216890 DAKSHYA VANIJYA LIMITED 500000.0 Active 01/08/2016 - U52609WB2016PLC217329 DAIVAT VINIMAY LIMITED 500000.0 Active 30/08/2016 - U52609WB2017PLC220280 CHATURBHUJA DEALCOM LIMITED 500000.0 Active 28/03/2017 - U52609WB2017PLC220386 KAMESHWARI SALES LIMITED 500000.0 Active 30/03/2017 - U74900WB2013PLC193206 GADAGRAJ SERVICES LIMITED 500000.0 Active 13/05/2013 - U74900WB2013PLC193944 GOPTA TRADECOM LIMITED 500000.0 Active 29/05/2013 - U74900WB2013PLC195123 GANADHIRAJ BROKING ADVISORS LIMITED 500000.0 Active 27/06/2013 - -
Associated with Directors