PINTU PANDE
-
About PINTU PANDE,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U13203WB1987PTC042226 BRIJLAL DWARKA PRASAD PVT LTD 1520000.0 Active 04/05/2015 - U28939WB1989PTC046766 GURU FORGING AND AGRICO PVT LTD. 2142710.0 Active 12/03/2015 - U45400WB2011PTC159752 JAIVEER INFRA PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 12/03/2015 - U51109WB1997PTC083491 BHOOTNATH MARKETING PRIVATE LIMITED 5002100.0 Active 04/05/2015 - U70101WB2007PTC119436 YASH HIRISE PRIVATE LIMITED 450000.0 Active 04/05/2015 - U70101WB2007PTC119445 DJSS HIRISE PRIVATE LIMITED 450000.0 Active 18/03/2015 - U70102WB2010PTC153455 MA AMBALIKA REALTORS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 12/03/2015 - U70102WB2010PTC154478 SHIVANGI INFRA REALTY PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 31/03/2015 - U70102WB2011PTC158845 JAIVEER REALTY PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 12/03/2015 - U70109WB2010PTC153454 MA AMBALIKA DEVELOPERS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 12/03/2015 - U70109WB2010PTC153457 PADMA COMPLEX PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 12/03/2015 - U70109WB2011PTC157377 PADMA REALTY PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 04/05/2015 - U70109WB2011PTC158847 PADMA MANSIONS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 12/03/2015 - U70200WB2010PTC153456 MA AMBALIKA HOUSING PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 12/03/2015 - U70200WB2011PTC158846 PADMA CONCLAVE PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 12/03/2015 - -
Associated with Directors
SUNIL KUMAR PANDEY Director DWARKA PRASAD DABRIWAL Director SANJIV KUMAR DABRIWAL Director