PRAMOD KUMAR BAID
-
About PRAMOD KUMAR BAID,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U31501WB2005PTC106411 EASTREN FLUORESCENT PVT LTD 996000.0 Active 05/01/2015 - U67120WB1995PTC076190 SAPPERS FINANCE AND CONSULTANCY PVT.LTD. 28100000.0 Active 26/10/2014 - U70101WB1988PTC044401 WHEELERS DEVELOPERS PVT LTD 21880000.0 Active 27/03/2017 - U74899WB1995PTC131767 CHANAKYA FINVEST PRIVATE LIMITED 55446000.0 Active 07/08/2015 - -
Associated with Directors
JATAN KUMAR BAID Director RAJESH JAIN Director VINOD KUMAR BAID Director