PARASHURAM KACHARU SURYAWANSHI
-
About PARASHURAM KACHARU SURYAWANSHI,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U45400MH2012PTC227805 SUNANDINI BUILDCON PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 06/03/2017 - U70103MH2017PTC292151 YUDHVEER BUILDCON PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 07/03/2017 - U70103MH2017PTC292360 YUTNESH DEVELOPERS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 14/03/2017 - U70109MH2017PTC292147 ACHALESWAR DEVELOPERS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 07/03/2017 - U70109MH2017PTC292148 DHARMAKETU DEVELOPERS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 07/03/2017 - U70200MH2017PTC291751 ACHALAPATI DEVCON PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 28/02/2017 - -
Associated with Directors
SATISH SURYAKANT SAWANT Director MANOJ MALPANI Director SUNIL SUBHAJI SHIRKE Director