PRADIP KUMAR SOM
-
About PRADIP KUMAR SOM,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U45201WB1995PTC073030 SARIT CONSTRUCTIONS PVT LTD 1200000.0 Active 03/01/2018 - U45401OR2014PTC018194 SHRI JAGDISH SPINNING PARK PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 28/11/2017 - U51109WB2006PTC110097 AKASH DEALERS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 30/11/2017 - U52100WB2007PTC117399 GOODWILL TRACON PRIVATE LIMITED 2750840.0 Active 01/12/2017 - U52100WB2007PTC117401 LIMELIGHT COMMERCIAL PRIVATE LIMITED 3005000.0 Active 06/12/2017 - U70101WB1995PTC072767 NRIPESH BUILDERS PVT LTD 1200000.0 Active 04/01/2018 - U70101WB1995PTC073043 PARNA ESTATES PVT LTD 1200000.0 Active 05/01/2018 - -
Associated with Directors
SIDHESH SARDA Director