QUAISER PARVEZ
-
About QUAISER PARVEZ,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U45200MH2007PTC173216 DELPHI REALTIES PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 01/09/2016 - U45200MH2014PTC258764 SRC ESTATE PROJECTS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 07/09/2017 - U45201MH2014PTC258381 RADIUS ESTATE PROJECTS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 05/06/2017 - U45400MH2008PTC177340 SHOWBIZ REAL ESTATE PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 10/08/2016 - U45400MH2014PTC256374 SC INFRAVENTURES PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 07/09/2017 - U45400MH2015PTC261624 AADITRI ESTATE PROJECTS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 07/09/2017 - U70100MH1982PTC026183 VISHWAROOP RESIDENCY PRIVATE LIMITED 3981000.0 Active 23/03/2016 - -
Associated with Directors
JITEN BHAGWAN UTTWANI Director ANIL NANDLAL CHHABRIA Director