RAKESH GOVINDCHAND MEHTA
-
About RAKESH GOVINDCHAND MEHTA,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U40104MH2008PTC177326 MEHTA RENEWABLE ENERGY PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Converted to LLP 04/01/2008 - U45201RJ2011PTC035699 MANGALDEEP INFRATECH PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Converted to LLP 29/06/2011 - U65990MH1994PLC078478 MEHTA EQUITIES LIMITED 30570000.0 Active 21/11/2005 - U67110MH2007PTC170377 MEHTA CAPITAL MANAGEMENT PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 27/04/2007 - U67120MH2000PTC127716 JAI GURUDEV CONSULTANCY SERVICES PRIVATE LIMITED 336840.0 Active 08/02/2011 - U67120MH2002PTC134632 MEHTA FINSTOCK PRIVATE LIMITED 3000000.0 Active 18/08/2006 - U67190MH1995PLC088709 MEHTA FINANCIAL SERVICES LIMITED 6832570.0 Active 21/11/2005 - U72900MH2000PTC128026 MEHTA COMMODITIES PVT LTD 3000110.0 Active 06/09/2004 - U80904MH2007NPL170544 SHREE JAIN SWETAMBER KHARTARGUTCH SANGH MUMBAI 2425500.0 Active 03/05/2007 - U85100MH2009NPL192735 EPILEPSY FOUNDATION 0.0 Active 27/05/2009 - U85300MH2007NPL170194 MUMBAI VAISH SEVA SANSTHAN 1143621.0 Active 21/04/2007 - U85300MH2007NPL170215 MEHTA FOUNDATION 314207.0 Active 23/04/2007 - -
Associated with Directors