RAJESH DINANATH CHATURVEDI
-
About RAJESH DINANATH CHATURVEDI,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U51900MH1993PTC073121 HARINIM TRADE & TRAVELS PRIVATE LIMITED 1625000.0 Active 26/12/1994 - U65923MH2014PTC253837 ACUVISION CAPITAL AND FINANCE PRIVATE LIMITED 25200000.0 Active 04/03/2014 - U65990MH1990PTC056666 CHATURVEDI & SHAH CONSULTING PRIVATE LIMITED 1000000.0 Converted to LLP and Dissolved 01/09/2006 - U70100MH2011PTC215692 PRADEEP SANDEEP REALTIES PRIVATE LIMITED 10000000.0 Active 03/04/2011 - U70101MH2010PTC209977 SYMETRIC REALTIES PRIVATE LIMITED 10000000.0 Active 11/11/2010 - U73100GJ1991PTC015046 GIRDHAR MORARI AGRO RESEARCH PRIVATE LIMITED 300000.0 Converted to LLP 15/02/2016 - U74999MH2016OPC271981 RRR CORPORATE SERVICES PRIVATE LIMITED (OPC) 100000.0 Active 12/01/2016 - U85100HR2013PTC048389 NAYATI HEALTHCARE & RESEARCH PRIVATE LIMITED 400000000.0 Active 22/08/2014 - -
Associated with Directors