RAHUL CHANDRAKANT KIRLOSKAR
-
About RAHUL CHANDRAKANT KIRLOSKAR,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date L27101PN1991PLC063223 KIRLOSKAR FERROUS INDUSTRIES LTD 686540405.0 Active 28/10/2013 - L29120PN1974PLC110307 KIRLOSKAR PNEUMATIC COMPANY LIMITED 128443380.0 Active 30/09/1993 - L29120PN2009PLC133351 KIRLOSKAR OIL ENGINES LIMITED 289227722.0 Active 31/03/2010 - U24231TN1992PLC062306 J.K. FENNER (INDIA) LIMITED 724830660.0 Active 13/03/2015 - U29308PN2016PTC167173 KIRLOSKAR SOLAR TECHNOLOGIES PRIVATE LIMITED 60000000.0 Active 16/11/2016 - U31102MH1965PLC013362 KIRLOSKAR PROPRIETARY LIMITED 510800.0 Active 12/03/2010 - U65993MH1972PTC016178 ASARA SALES AND INVESTMENT PRIVATE LIMITED 446600.0 Active 12/03/2010 - U65993PN1992PTC064865 ALPAK INVESTMENTS PVT LTD 3621500.0 Active 15/01/1992 - U74900PN2011PTC138321 GREENTEK SYSTEMS (INDIA) PRIVATE LIMITED 345000000.0 Active 19/01/2011 - U74999PN2011NPL139899 PUNE CITY CONNECT DEVELOPMENT FOUNDATION 100000.0 Active 30/06/2016 - U74999PN2016NPL165023 S.L. KIRLOSKAR CSR FOUNDATION 500000.0 Active 16/06/2016 - U74999PN2017NPL172629 SAMARTH UDYOG TECHNOLOGY FORUM 300000.0 Active 20/09/2017 - -
Associated with Directors