RAKESH SHARMA
-
About RAKESH SHARMA,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date L45203UP2007PLC033119 JAYPEE INFRATECH LIMITED 13889334970.0 Active 14/03/2012 - U10200MP2009SGC021909 MP JAYPEE COAL LIMITED 100000000.0 Active 03/08/2011 - U22219DL2007PTC166923 OHM PRODUCTS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 13/08/2007 - U26941UP2004PLC029175 JAYPEE CEMENT LIMITED 3559507000.0 Amalgamated 27/12/2006 - U40101HP2002PLC025095 JAYPEE KARCHAM HYDRO CORPORATION LIMITED 20100000000.0 Amalgamated 30/12/2006 - U40101UP2007SGC032835 PRAYAGRAJ POWER GENERATION COMPANY LIMITED 32291898000.0 Active 11/03/2010 - U40102UP2007PLC032843 SANGAM POWER GENERATION COMPANY LIMITED 5519772000.0 Active 11/03/2010 - U51109UP1979PTC004900 JAYPEE TECHNICAL CONSULTANTS PRIVATE LIMITED 100020.0 Active 01/02/1992 - U55101UP2008PTC050056 TIGER HILLS HOLIDAY RESORT PRIVATE LIMITED 1030000.0 Active 27/10/2009 - -
Associated with Directors