RENUKA MUNJAL
-
About RENUKA MUNJAL,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U65910GJ1991PTC016109 AAYUSH FINANCE AND INVESTMENTS PVT LTD 100000.0 Active 13/08/1991 - U67120PB1981PTC004753 ANADI INVESTMENTS PVT LTD 2768990.0 Active 15/05/2010 - U72200DL2005PLC136696 AMTIER INFOTECH LIMITED 1025000.0 Active 26/05/2005 - U99999DL1980PTC010979 O K HOSIERY MILLS PVT LTD 1500000.0 Active 28/04/2014 - -
Associated with Directors
MAHESH MUNJAL Director JAYANT PARMANAND SHAH Director AASHIMA MUNJAL Director