RAMESH CHANDER BAWA
-
About RAMESH CHANDER BAWA,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date L65999MH1986PLC147981 IL & FS INVESTMENT MANAGERS LIMITED 628085480.0 Active 11/02/2011 - U40300DL2007PLC163679 IL&FS ENERGY DEVELOPMENT COMPANY LIMITED 13182254310.0 Active 01/08/2011 - U45201MH2006PLC165803 IL&FS MARITIME INFRASTRUCTURE COMPANY LIMITED 1591942470.0 Active 14/08/2007 - U65191MH2012PLC226314 IL&FS CAPITAL ADVISORS LIMITED 100000000.0 Active 20/01/2012 - U65191MH2013PLC239438 IL&FS INFRA ASSET MANAGEMENT LIMITED 193980000.0 Active 13/05/2013 - U65990MH1995PLC093241 IL&FS FINANCIAL SERVICES LIMITED 3906670550.0 Active 01/05/2011 - U65999AP2016PLC103663 ANDHRA PRADESH URBAN INFRASTRUCTURE ASSET MANAGEMENT LIMITED 200000000.0 Active 15/07/2016 - U72200TN2006PLC060330 IL&FS TAMIL NADU POWER COMPANY LIMITED 1759697650.0 Active 30/06/2009 - U74992MH2006PLC163337 IL&FS SECURITIES SERVICES LIMITED 237834590.0 Active 04/11/2011 - -
Associated with Directors