RAJENDRA KUMAR DALMIA
-
About RAJENDRA KUMAR DALMIA,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U01222MH1969PLC014244 BIRLA CONSULTANTS LIMITED 1200000.0 Active 24/02/1999 - U65920MH1986PLC041322 BIRLA INDUSTRIAL FINANCE (INDIA) LIMITED 950160.0 Active 06/12/2016 - U67120MH1987PLC043065 BIRLA INDUSTRIAL INVESTMENTS (INDIA) LTD 530160.0 Active 06/12/2016 - U70100MH2017PTC303291 BIRLA ESTATES PRIVATE LIMITED 500000.0 Active 26/12/2017 - U74999MH1964PLC012924 UDYOG SERVICES LIMITED 505000.0 Active 06/08/1998 - U91110MH1954NPL009385 THE COTTON TEXTILES EXPORT PROMOTION COUNCIL 0.0 Active 18/10/2000 - -
Associated with Directors