RUPINDER GUPTA
-
About RUPINDER GUPTA,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U00000PB2003PLC026525 ABHISHEK CORPORATE SERVICES LIMITED 505000.0 Active 20/08/2005 - U51101PB2007PTC031248 PRUDENT TRADERS PRIVATE LIMITED 9850000.0 Active 30/03/2016 - U70109PB2008PTC031766 CREATIVELINE DEVELOPERS PRIVATE LIMITED 500000.0 Active 18/06/2011 - U93000PB2011NPL034806 VIVEKANANDA SOCIAL FOUNDATION 500000.0 Active 09/03/2011 - -
Associated with Directors
RAMAN KUMAR Director RAJ KUMAR THUKRAL Director PARMOD KUMAR SHARMA Director DAVINDAR SINGH SOKHI Director