RAGHUNATH ANANT MASHELKAR
-
About RAGHUNATH ANANT MASHELKAR,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date L17110MH1973PLC019786 RELIANCE INDUSTRIES LIMITED 63335035190.0 Active 09/06/2007 - L24110MH1947PLC005719 PIRAMAL ENTERPRISES LIMITED 345576200.0 Active 21/12/2011 - L29299PN1980PLC022787 THERMAX LIMITED. 238312600.0 Active 29/01/2008 - U22121PN1948PTC006177 SAKAL PAPERS PRIVATE LIMITED 8924362.0 Active 13/08/2008 - U24232DL2011PTC217394 INVICTUS ONCOLOGY PRIVATE LIMITED 20642530.0 Active 04/02/2013 - U74210MH1977GAT019689 GHARDA SCIENTIFIC RESEARCH FOUNDATION 0.0 Active 29/07/2010 - U85100MH1991GAT061430 GHARDA MEDICAL & ADVANCED TECHNOLOGIES FOUNDATION 0.0 Active 10/11/2011 - U85300PN2008NPL132108 INTERNATIONAL LONGEVITY CENTRE- INDIA 0.0 Active 30/09/2009 - -
Associated with Directors