RAM LAL AGGARWAL
-
About RAM LAL AGGARWAL,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U27209DL1988PTC032849 SHREE ALUMINIUM PRIVATE LIMITED 500000.0 Active 18/08/1988 - U74120DL2008PTC174778 BAVANI FINCON PRIVATE LIMITED 4550000.0 Active 29/02/2008 - U74899DL1981PTC011385 SHIVA ALLOYS PRIVATE LIMITED 2500000.0 Active 19/06/1984 - U74899DL1985PTC019806 JYOTI TRADE LINKS PRIVATE LIMITED 995700.0 Active 26/09/2006 - U74899DL1985PTC019903 GLORY STEELS PRIVATE LIMITED 290000.0 Active 01/10/1991 - U74899DL1988PTC030314 KAY COMPRESSORS PRIVATE LIMITED 692000.0 Active 30/09/1990 - U74899DL1993PTC051719 YKRR HOLDINGS AND INDUSTRIES PRIVATE LIMITED 2486000.0 Active 16/02/2012 -