RANGARAJAN SOURIRAJAN
-
About RANGARAJAN SOURIRAJAN,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U33111WB2016PTC209503 MAMTORA LENS TECHNOLOGY PRIVATE LIMITED 20000000.0 Active 06/10/2016 - U33112TG2008PTC057791 ESSILOR 20 20 OPTICS PRIVATE LIMITED 42671000.0 Active 03/03/2015 - U33120GJ2006PTC047676 ESSILOR DELTA CNC LENS PRIVATE LIMITED 15000000.0 Active 05/03/2015 - U33201GJ2013PTC074444 DEEPAK LENS PRIVATE LIMITED 23000000.0 Active 05/03/2015 - U33202GJ2009PTC058889 ESSILOR LENS & SPECTS PRIVATE LIMITED 35000000.0 Active 21/03/2016 - U51394TZ2008PTC014509 ESSILOR SANKAR & CO OPTICS PRIVATE LIMITED 75000000.0 Active 17/02/2015 - U74900KA2009PTC051377 CP SERVICES PRIVATE LIMITED 6327000.0 Active 18/08/2016 - -
Associated with Directors