RASHMIBEN MAHESHCHANDRA VAKIL
-
About RASHMIBEN MAHESHCHANDRA VAKIL,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U52609GJ1991PTC015217 KEYA DEALERS PRIVATE LIMITED 2500000.0 Active 18/03/1991 - U65910GJ1970PLC001785 SWASHRAYA BENEFIT LIMITED 20812800.0 Active 30/09/2009 25/03/2017 U70109GJ1993PTC020704 KAVISH DEVELOPERS PRIVATE LIMITED 1860000.0 Active 08/04/2004 - -
Associated with Directors
MAHESH GIRDHARLAL VAKIL Director KAILASHCHAND RAGHUBIRSINGH JAIN Director