RAHUL GAUR
-
About RAHUL GAUR,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U22100DL2011PTC215475 BRYS MEDICARE PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 09/03/2011 - U28112DL2010PTC203825 BRYS INTERNATIONAL PRIVATE LIMITED 100000000.0 Active 08/06/2010 - U55101DL2010PTC203992 BRYS HOTELS PRIVATE LIMITED 86400000.0 Active 11/06/2010 - U63020DL2013PTC251883 BRYS HOSPITALITY PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 09/05/2013 - U70101DL2014PTC268245 BRYS BUILDERS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 24/06/2014 - U70102DL2013PTC258830 RIGHT REALTECH PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 16/06/2014 - U70102DL2013PTC258880 BRYS INFRADEVELOPERS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 17/10/2014 - U70109DL2012PTC244957 NEO INFRASTRUCTURE PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 10/06/2013 - -
Associated with Directors
NAVNEET BHADLA Director VIKRAM KATHURIA Director DAVENDER MOHAN SAXENA Director