RAKESH JAIKARAN BANSAL
-
About RAKESH JAIKARAN BANSAL,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U24110MH1995PTC189183 ARADHANA GASES PVT LTD 4937500.0 Active 05/05/2007 - U26933GJ2013PLC074631 CELCON GREEN LIMITED 17918150.0 Active 20/06/2013 - U27109MH1999PTC118754 ALANG ISPAT PRIVATE LIMITED 9894840.0 Active 09/03/1999 - U29120GJ1988PTC010692 GANESH WHEELS PRIVATE LIMITED 7500000.0 Active 11/08/1999 - U35117MH2003PTC189180 AGRASEN SHIPBREAKERS PRIVATE LIMITED 11500000.0 Active 01/04/2007 - U45200MH2007PTC172000 SAINITI INFRASTRUCTURE PRIVATE LIMITED 1500000.0 Active 26/06/2007 - U51109WB2000PTC092328 H & D BROKERAGE PRIVATE LIMITED 11492000.0 Active 01/09/2011 - U67120MH1995PLC084539 ESQUIRE SHARE AND STOCK BROKERS LIMITED 33000000.0 Active 20/07/1999 - -
Associated with Directors