RAJENDRA PRASAD SATYANARAYAN AGARWAL
-
About RAJENDRA PRASAD SATYANARAYAN AGARWAL,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U17120MH1990PTC057717 SHREE NAGANI SILK MILLS PRIVATE LIMITED 9988000.0 Active 03/06/1993 - U17120MH2010PTC210851 SHREEDHAR COTSYN PRIVATE LIMITED 9955000.0 Active 04/02/2014 - U17290RJ2012PLC040425 SRM SPINNERS LIMITED 135000000.0 Active 30/01/2013 - U70200MH2001PTC130951 RAM KRUPA PROPERTIES PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 22/02/2001 - -
Associated with Directors