RAMESH CHANDRA BOSE TUMMALA
-
About RAMESH CHANDRA BOSE TUMMALA,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date L26942TG1979PLC002485 KAKATIYA CEMENT SUGAR AND INDUSTRIES LIMITED 77739000.0 Active 31/01/2001 - L45201AP1987PLC007959 IVRCL LIMITED 1565795384.0 Active 30/09/2005 - L70100TG1996PLC024459 IVRCL ASSETS & HOLDINGS LIMITED 1970482640.0 Amalgamated 12/02/2011 - L99999TG1991PLC012764 DIVYASHAKTI GRANITES LIMITED 102688700.0 Active 01/11/2013 - U40100TG2002PTC038331 SIDESHWARI POWER GENERATION PRIVATE LIMITED 101700000.0 Active 07/02/2017 - U40101DL2005PLC141611 COUNTRYWIDE POWER TRANSMISSION LIMITED 500000.0 Active 06/01/2006 - U40101TG2009PTC064056 KARTIKEYA POWER LOGICS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 11/10/2013 - U45200TG1983PLC003796 SEW INFRASTRUCTURE LIMITED 613831490.0 Active 27/05/2010 - U45500TG2017PTC116251 ARVEN INFRASTRUCTURE PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 30/03/2017 - -
Associated with Directors