RISHI KAMLESH AGARWAL
-
About RISHI KAMLESH AGARWAL,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date L61200GJ1985PLC007730 ABG SHIPYARD LTD 2015046640.0 Active 11/02/1989 - U36941MH1996PLC185707 VADRAJ CEMENT LIMITED 20000000000.0 Active 31/03/2012 - U40100GJ2009PLC058694 ABG ENERGY (GUJARAT) LIMITED 1500000000.0 Active 31/03/2012 - U62100MH1996PTC100477 SANTA SECURITIES PRIVATE LIMITED C N 4100180.0 Amalgamated 16/12/2002 - U99999MH1993PTC073745 ABG INTERNATIONAL PRIVATE LIMITED 70950160.0 Active 03/09/1993 - -
Associated with Directors