RAM AVTAR MITTAL
-
About RAM AVTAR MITTAL,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U27107RJ1985PTC003355 RAMA SPECIAL STEELS PRIVATE LIMITED 24239000.0 Active 25/07/2000 - U45201WB2003PTC095861 DEVSTHAN REALTORS PRIVATE LIMITED 3475000.0 Active 08/11/2004 - U51109WB1991PTC052253 ASKA ROADWAYS PVT LTD 18230600.0 Active 28/05/2003 - U60231AS1973PTC001418 EASTERN ROAD CARRIERS PRIVATE LIMITED 9363800.0 Active 28/05/1973 - U60231AS1995PLC004637 ERC INDIA LIMITED 17481500.0 Active 18/12/1995 - U67120WB1987PTC042730 ASKA INVESTMENTS PVT LTD 11885200.0 Active 04/03/1991 - -
Associated with Directors
RAVINDRA KUMAR MITTAL Director BIPUL MITTAL Director GOPAL KRISHNA MITTAL Director CHETNA MITTAL Director