RAJEEV AGARWAL
-
About RAJEEV AGARWAL,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U45200MP2010PTC024902 RISHABH DEVCONS PRIVATE LIMITED 5000000.0 Active 03/01/2011 - U45203DL2008PLC182552 QUIET MARCHERS INFRASTRUCTURE LIMITED 1000000.0 Active 27/08/2008 - U70101MP2010PTC024351 PURPLE INFRATECH & DEVELOPERS PRIVATE LIMITED 5000000.0 Active 01/01/2011 - U74899DL1995PTC064810 R.P. BUILDTECH CONSULTANTS PRIVATE LIMITED 2000000.0 Active 30/01/1995 - U80904DL2017PTC315073 SPR SKILL EDUCATION PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 24/03/2017 - -
Associated with Directors