RITESH TALREJA
-
About RITESH TALREJA,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U15419UP2001PTC025992 RAMA KRISHNA BAKERS PRIVATE LIMITED 3200600.0 Active 20/10/2003 - U15419UP2004PTC029233 AMBAJI FOODS (INDIA) PRIVATE LIMITED 8800000.0 Active 15/10/2008 - U15432UP1993PTC014992 KANPUR INFRASTRUCTURES PRIVATE LIMITED 1300000.0 Active 15/11/1999 - U45400UP2010PTC039640 SHREE RUDRA COLONISERS PRIVATE LIMITED 200000.0 Active 19/02/2010 - U45500UP2017PTC093341 UNIBUILD INFRA PROJECTS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 22/05/2017 - U70102UP2014PTC066366 SACHRIT INFRA PROJECTS PRIVATE LIMITED 150000.0 Active 30/09/2014 - -
Associated with Directors