RAJEEV TALREJA
-
About RAJEEV TALREJA,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U15122UP2011PTC047905 KANHA WHEAT PRODUCTS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 14/12/2011 - U15122UP2013PTC059831 R.D. BAKERS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 30/09/2013 - U15419UP2001PTC025992 RAMA KRISHNA BAKERS PRIVATE LIMITED 3200600.0 Active 17/04/2001 - U15432UP1993PTC014992 KANPUR INFRASTRUCTURES PRIVATE LIMITED 1300000.0 Active 05/01/1993 - U27310UP1989PTC011429 SPBL ENERGY PRIVATE LIMITED 3000000.0 Active 07/07/2015 - U45400UP2012PTC049954 MTG INFRA POWER PRIVATE LIMITED 6000000.0 Active 19/04/2012 - U51211UP1994PTC016579 RISHI BAKERS PRIVATE LIMITED 2402000.0 Active 01/04/2000 - -
Associated with Directors