RAMESH GANESH IYER
-
About RAMESH GANESH IYER,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date L65921MH1991PLC059642 MAHINDRA AND MAHINDRA FINANCIAL SERVICES LIMITED 1235529920.0 Active 30/04/2001 - U18101MH1995PLC095482 NBS INTERNATIONAL LIMITED 245504840.0 Active 15/11/2006 - U35999MH2008PLC180385 MAHINDRA FIRST CHOICE SERVICES LIMITED 2640000000.0 Active 15/09/2008 - U64200MH1994PLC083996 MAHINDRA FIRST CHOICE WHEELS LIMITED 768729200.0 Active 30/08/2004 - U65922MH2007PLC169791 MAHINDRA RURAL HOUSING FINANCE LIMITED 951321660.0 Active 09/04/2007 - U65990MH1987PLC042609 MAHINDRA INSURANCE BROKERS LIMITED 25773200.0 Active 06/09/2002 - U72200MH2008PTC186789 MAHINDRA BUSINESS & CONSULTING SERVICES PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Amalgamated 16/06/2009 - U91990MH2004NPL146931 FINANCE INDUSTRY DEVELOPMENT COUNCIL 0.0 Active 22/07/2004 - -
Associated with Directors