RAJESH AHUJA
-
About RAJESH AHUJA,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U15130MH1997PTC112457 FRESHNELLA FOODS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 15/12/1997 - U15200MH1994PTC083758 SEAROCK ENTERPRISES PRIVATE LIMITED 1870000.0 Active 14/12/1994 - U15200MH1998PTC113617 ADARSH ICECREAMS AND FROZEN FOODS PRIVATE LIMITED 3402000.0 Active 18/02/1998 - U23120MH1997PTC105358 ECONOMY PNEUMATICS PRIVATE LIMITED 350300.0 Active 24/01/1997 - U52205MH2005PTC157985 SEVEN STAR ICECREAM PRIVATE LIMITED 20100000.0 Active 12/12/2005 - U74999MH2016PTC285076 ECO WOOSUNG INDIA PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 23/08/2016 - U99999MH1971PTC015123 ECONOMY REFRIGERATION PRIVATE LIMITED 28588500.0 Active 23/04/1971 - -
Associated with Directors
RAVISH YOGDHIYAN AHUJA Director MANISHA RAJESH AHUJA Director TUSHAR SHANTILAL SHAH Director