RAKESH AHUJA
-
About RAKESH AHUJA,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date L24117RJ1979PLC002099 LORDS CHLORO ALKALI LIMITED 251538610.0 Active 28/03/2005 - U45200DL2006PTC155943 AHUJA AND ANAND CONSTRUCTS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 28/11/2006 - U45201DL2008PTC175266 JBG REALTECH PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 18/03/2008 - U45201UP2006PLC031732 ALLIANCE PROMOTERS LIMITED 590924450.0 Active 19/09/2007 - U45204DL2008PTC175438 KBN REALCON PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 18/03/2008 - U45400DL2007PLC169927 OPUS REALITY DEVELOPMENT LIMITED 222572290.0 Active 27/10/2007 - U45400DL2008PTC174317 AUROCHEM LAND DEVELOPERS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 18/03/2008 - U51311DL1998PLC097090 JOVEES HERBAL CARE INDIA LIMITED 1560000.0 Active 26/11/1998 - U70109DL2006PTC150757 AHUJA AND ANAND REAL ESTATES PRIVATE LIMITED 34004800.0 Active 09/07/2006 - U72900DL2000PTC104201 MATRIX DOTCOM INFONET PRIVATE LIMITED. 2442200.0 Active 09/11/2005 - U74120DL2008PTC174830 KUTUMBH BUILDERS PRIVATE LIMTED 100000.0 Active 15/03/2008 - U85100DL2012NPL230031 DESI CARE FOUNDATION 0.0 Active 27/03/2017 - -
Associated with Directors