RAMPRAKASH MURLIDHAR MISHRA
-
About RAMPRAKASH MURLIDHAR MISHRA,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date L31101MH1984PLC032773 BIRLA POWER SOLUTIONS LIMITED 2135196905.0 Under Liquidation 14/08/2013 - L85100MH2008PLC184689 BIRLA PACIFIC MEDSPA LIMITED 1121425840.0 Active 25/05/2012 05/03/2015 U24100MH2008PLC177694 BIRLA RESEARCH & LIFESCIENCES LIMITED 727176900.0 Under Liquidation 25/05/2012 - U51410MH1998PTC115139 SAHAYOG SUPER GAS PRIVATE LIMITED 725200.0 Active 30/12/2006 - U74999MH2008PLC187077 BIRLA SURYA LIMITED 3351615840.0 Under Liquidation 06/08/2010 - -
Associated with Directors