RAMESH CHAND ARORA
-
About RAMESH CHAND ARORA,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U65999GJ2017PTC098309 KSBL FOREX (IFSC) PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 17/07/2017 - U66000DL2016PTC304239 KSBL INSURANCE BROKING PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 10/08/2016 - U74899HR1993PLC045764 KSBL SECURITIES LIMITED 11700000.0 Active 08/02/1995 - U74900DL2016PTC292637 KUMAR VOCATIONAL COURSES ACADEMY PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 15/03/2016 - -
Associated with Directors
TIKA RAM KHARE Director ASHISH SINGH Director SUMAN ARORA Director Pranjal Gupta Director