RAKESH KUMAR DAGA
-
About RAKESH KUMAR DAGA,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date L51109WB1982PLC035002 RIKHAV COMMERCIAL CO LTD 2411500.0 Active 26/05/2004 - U27209WB1983PLC036484 BIKEGEE RESOURCES LTD 4846000.0 Active 24/05/2004 - U51226WB1999PTC090449 S. J. TEA & TRADERS PRIVATE LIMITED 5855200.0 Converted to LLP 29/08/2002 - U51420WB1997PTC084974 PADMANABH STEEL & TRADING PRIVATE LIMITED 5285000.0 Converted to LLP 30/10/2002 -