RAM AWATAR AGARWALA
-
About RAM AWATAR AGARWALA,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U10103WB2007PTC117640 CANIS MINES AND MINERALS PRIVATE LIMITED 230000.0 Active 06/08/2007 - U26942ML2007PLC008269 MEGHABOND CEMENTS LIMITED 500000.0 Active 18/07/2007 - U40101ML2009PLC008391 BRIJRAJ POWER & METALLICS LIMITED 21950000.0 Active 11/12/2009 - U40102ML2008PLC008450 BRIJRAJ BIJALI LIMITED 500000.0 Active 09/09/2008 - U40104WB2006PLC112070 OASYS POWER LIMITED 4160000.0 Active 12/12/2006 - U45201ML2007PLC008266 MEGHALAYA INFRATECH LIMITED 19876640.0 Active 01/06/2010 - U85110ML2010PLC008395 MEGHALAYA HEALTH CARE SERVICES LIMITED 560000.0 Active 06/01/2010 - -
Associated with Directors