RAJINDERKUMAR UTTAMCHAND MIGLANI
-
About RAJINDERKUMAR UTTAMCHAND MIGLANI,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date L27100MH1970PLC014621 UTTAM VALUE STEELS LIMITED 6701330535.0 Active 06/11/2015 - L27104MH1985PLC035806 UTTAM GALVA STEELS LIMITED 1422601030.0 Active 31/12/2012 - U11100HR2010PLC040858 MIG OIL & GAS LIMITED 500000.0 Active 08/07/2010 - U27100KA2010PLC053231 UTTAM GALVA FEROUS LIMITED 2225148000.0 Active 16/03/2011 - U27200HR2007PLC037927 UTTAM GALVA METALLICS LIMITED 11681111200.0 Active 13/09/2007 - U45201MH2006PLC164010 VIBRANT REALTY & INFRASTRUCTURE LIMITED 50000000.0 Active 04/09/2006 - U45202HR2008PTC049526 REVIVE BUILDZONE AND DEALERS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 23/03/2009 - U45202MH1994PTC081286 PARITOSA PROPERTIES PRIVATE LIMITED 8700000.0 Active 02/07/2012 - U65990MH1988PLC212607 SHREE UTTAM STEEL AND POWER LIMITED 1593483.0 Amalgamated 10/02/2006 - U70101MH1994PTC081366 HELI PROPERTIES PRIVATE LIMITED 8000000.0 Active 09/12/2010 - U73100MH1970NPL014686 M.VISVESVARAYA INDUSTRIAL RESEARCH AND DEVELOPMENT CENTRE 0.0 Active 27/08/2008 - -
Associated with Directors