RAMAKRISHNA THONDEPU
-
About RAMAKRISHNA THONDEPU,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U11100TG1988PLC009138 SREE KAILAS INDUSTRIAL GASES LIMITED 20000000.0 Active 16/10/2006 - U40102TG2014PTC093108 MYTRAH VAYU (GODAVARI) PRIVATE LIMITED 212560000.0 Active 15/03/2014 - U40106TG2013PTC085808 BINDU JAL URJA PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 15/03/2014 - U40107DL2010PTC205929 NIDHI WIND FARMS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 23/10/2013 - U40108TG2012PTC081624 MYTRAH VAYU (INDRAVATI) PRIVATE LIMITED 290800000.0 Active 15/03/2014 - U40300TG2014PTC095357 MYTRAH TEJAS POWER PRIVATE LIMITED 500000.0 Active 22/08/2014 - U45209TG2012PLC083316 BINDU URJA INFRASTRUCTURE LIMITED 1795000.0 Active 23/10/2013 - U65910TG1989PLC009527 SREE RAVI KAILAS FINANCE LIMITED 500070.0 Active 16/10/2006 - U70102AP1990PTC012071 H.R. SONS REAL ESTATE PVT.LTD. 1000000.0 Active 24/02/1995 - U74210TG1974PLC001767 A.P.MET-ENGG LIMITED 10000000.0 Active 10/01/2004 - -
Associated with Directors