RAM KISHORE KEJRIWAL
-
About RAM KISHORE KEJRIWAL,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U26941WB2003PLC096228 PURBANCHAL CEMENT LTD. 379595000.0 Active 26/07/2007 - U27102WB2001PLC093321 MAITHAN STEEL AND POWER LIMITED 98500000.0 Active 14/03/2015 - U40102WB2004PTC097869 NORTH EAST INDUSTRIAL POWER PRIVATE LIMITED 12900000.0 Active 18/01/2008 - U51109WB1994PTC066287 WOODHAT DISTRIBUTORS PVT LTD 32317000.0 Active 02/04/2001 - U51109WB1995PTC074422 TOPLIGHT TRADELINK PVT LTD 22747000.0 Active 01/02/2008 - U51109WB1996PTC078530 TOPLINE DEALERS PVT LTD 15847000.0 Active 07/08/2006 - U51109WB1997PTC083453 SUPERDEAL SALES PRIVATE LIMITED 14869950.0 Active 06/03/2017 - U51909WB1994PTC061451 BIMALNATH IMPEX PVT LTD 30662000.0 Active 10/02/2004 - U51909WB1995PTC070975 ANINDRA SALES PVT LTD 15842750.0 Active 18/10/2005 - U51909WB1995PTC072063 NEGUS DISTRIBUTORS PVT LTD 17359000.0 Active 06/03/2017 - U51909WB1996PTC080012 SUBH DRISHTI CONSULTANTS PVT LTD 23983000.0 Active 23/02/2008 - U67120WB1996PTC077924 VENLON SECURITIES PVT LTD 26207100.0 Active 11/08/2006 - U70109WB1991PLC052777 RACCIE HOUSING & FINANCE LTD 30000000.0 Active 09/12/2009 - U74140WB1994PTC062187 ABBOTT MARKETING PVT LTD 10200000.0 Active 17/02/2006 - U74899DL1984PLC019667 INTERNATIONAL CREDIT CORPORATION LIMITED 4999970.0 Active 26/03/2007 - -
Associated with Directors