RAMESH KUMAR KEJRIWAL
-
About RAMESH KUMAR KEJRIWAL,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date L11100JH1975SGC001202 BIHAR AIR PRODUCTS LIMITED 7998625.0 Active 07/08/2006 - L70101WB1974PLC104781 PRATAP HOLDINGS LIMITED 2576000.0 Active 02/09/2005 - L99999MH1948PLC006830 BAGALKOT UDYOG LIMITED 8877896.0 Active 30/07/2001 - U15122WB2013PTC198619 AOL SUGAR AND INDUSTRIES PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 27/11/2013 - U17232WB1941PLC010659 POPULAR JUTE TRADING COMPANY LIMITED 500000.0 Active 29/05/2001 - U36900WB1999PTC104712 INDESSA GASES PRIVATE LIMITED 1000000.0 Active 11/03/2010 - U36934WB1974PLC053501 ASIATIC AIR-O-GAS ENGINEERING CO LTD 14004000.0 Active 15/01/2000 - U65990WB1977PLC136649 SANATAN INVESTMENT COMPANY LIMITED 2725000.0 Active 27/12/2004 - U65993WB1992PLC104779 SAMARESH INVESTMENTS LIMITED 5000000.0 Active 29/08/2005 - U67120WB1981PLC104933 P.A. INVESTMENTS LIMITED 1700000.0 Active 29/08/2005 - U67120WB1987PTC041843 SHREE BHAGYA LUXMI RESOURCES PVT. LTD. 4730000.0 Active 01/09/1998 - U74140WB1979PTC104928 TANNA ELECTRO-MECHANICS PRIVATE LIMITED 101000.0 Active 29/08/2005 - -
Associated with Directors