RAM DAYAL FARKIYA
-
About RAM DAYAL FARKIYA,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U27106MP1996PLC010528 VINOD ISPAT LIMITED 8761500.0 Active 01/03/2009 - U28999MP1995PTC009114 VIKAS FILLER METALS PRIVATE LIMITED 3110970.0 Active 20/11/2008 - U67120MP1995PTC009168 SKM RAMDIN ULTRATECH PRIVATE LIMITED 10000000.0 Active 14/03/1995 - U70100MP2008PTC020178 SUNSTAR INFRATECH PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 27/10/2014 - -
Associated with Directors
RAMESH CHAND DHANOTIA Director DINESH DHANOTIA Director SHYAM KUMAR KANJANI Director