RAJENDERA KUMAR SHARMA
-
About RAJENDERA KUMAR SHARMA,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U45207DL2006PTC150631 SHREE JAI AMBE HYDRO POWER & PROJECTS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Under Process of Striking Off 08/07/2006 - U70101DL2011PTC224863 JAI AMBE ECOBUILD PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 25/11/2017 - U74899DL1991PTC046362 WUNDERHOMMZ ENTERPRISES PRIVATE LIMITED 8100000.0 Active 10/05/2000 - U74899DL1992PLC050795 INVOGUE FURNISHERS AND BUILDERS LIMITED 30506000.0 Active 25/11/2017 - U74899DL1995PLC072861 WISDOM SECURITIES LIMITED 1007000.0 Active 05/07/2002 - U74899DL1995PTC065222 HILITE TRADES AND INVESTOFIN PRIVATE LIMITED 10525200.0 Active 28/03/1996 -