RAKESH AGARWAL
-
About RAKESH AGARWAL,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U27102WB2004PTC099668 R S SPONGE IRON PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 03/09/2004 - U27104WB1997PTC084835 I C ISPAT PRIVATE LIMITED 14915000.0 Amalgamated 20/08/2001 - U27109WB1994PLC066539 R.S.ISPAT LTD 80500000.0 Active 14/12/1994 - U27109WB1999PLC089428 BAJRANGBALI ROLLING MILLS LIMITED 37143340.0 Active 17/05/1999 - U27109WB2004PLC098583 R.S. CONCAST LIMITED 20660000.0 Active 20/05/2004 - U45203WB2005PTC105385 NORTH VALLEY DEVELOPERS PRIVATE LIMITED 500000.0 Active 21/12/2015 - U45400WB2007PLC114611 MAA AMBA TOWERS LIMITED 10150000.0 Active 26/03/2007 - U51109WB1991PTC051859 GOODWORTH INVESTMENTS PVT LTD 18250000.0 Active 24/12/2007 - U70109WB2010PTC155004 MAA AMBA NIRMAN PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 25/11/2010 - U70109WB2010PTC155005 MAA AMBA REAL ESTATE DEVELOPERS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 25/11/2010 -