RAJESH KUMAR BASU
-
About RAJESH KUMAR BASU,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U32109WB1997PTC084129 SHREE IMPEX PRIVATE LIMITED 8000000.0 Active 29/04/1997 - U32301WB1996PTC081869 ATARI ENTERTAINMENTS PRIVATE LIMITED 273000.0 Active 28/10/1996 - U70101WB1988PTC045788 LAKHI ESTATES & HOLDINGS PVT LTD. 7770000.0 Active 02/04/1996 - U70101WB1990PTC050454 ULTRA HOUSING DEVELOPER PVT LTD 2308200.0 Active 18/12/1992 - -
Associated with Directors
AJANTA BASU Director VIKASH MOHTA Director AKASH TANTIYA Director KUMARES HAJRA Director