RAAJEEV INDERJIT SHARMA
-
About RAAJEEV INDERJIT SHARMA,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U01200MH1984PTC033659 INDERLOK INFRA-AGRO PRIVATE LIMITED 500020.0 Active 26/12/1991 - U45200MH1972PTC015986 SHARMA ESTATES AND BUILDERS PRIVATE LIMITED 125000.0 Active 26/12/1991 - U45200MH1984PTC032896 M D CHOKSEY CONSTRUCTION COMPANY PRIVATE LIMITED 101000.0 Active 31/12/2001 - U45202MH1984PTC032980 NORTHERN BUILDERS PVT LTD 500200.0 Active 26/12/1991 - U70100MH1974PTC017668 SHARMA PROPERTIES PVT LTD 500000.0 Active 23/12/1991 - U70101MH1979PTC021831 INDERJIT PROPERTIES PRIVATE LIMITED 400000.0 Active 23/12/1991 - U92110MH1981PTC023899 AABSHAR FILMS PRIVATE LIMITED 105300.0 Active 24/03/1992 - -
Associated with Directors
RAKESH KUMAR SHARMA Director PRABHA SHARMA Director