RAKESH KUMAR SHARMA
-
About RAKESH KUMAR SHARMA,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U01200MH1984PTC033659 INDERLOK INFRA-AGRO PRIVATE LIMITED 500020.0 Active 01/07/1985 - U45200MH1972PTC015986 SHARMA ESTATES AND BUILDERS PRIVATE LIMITED 125000.0 Active 12/11/1984 - U45200MH1984PTC032896 M D CHOKSEY CONSTRUCTION COMPANY PRIVATE LIMITED 101000.0 Active 28/05/1984 - U45202MH1984PTC032980 NORTHERN BUILDERS PVT LTD 500200.0 Active 24/08/1984 - U70100MH1974PTC017668 SHARMA PROPERTIES PVT LTD 500000.0 Active 01/07/1985 - U70101MH1979PTC021831 INDERJIT PROPERTIES PRIVATE LIMITED 400000.0 Active 01/07/1985 - -
Associated with Directors
RAAJEEV INDERJIT SHARMA Director PRABHA SHARMA Director