RITESH BAWRI
-
About RITESH BAWRI,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U20211WB1994PTC201562 PRAGATI VENEERS PVT LTD 1282500.0 Amalgamated 25/10/2012 - U51909WB2006PTC107334 SAROJ VINIMAY PVT LTD 16708000.0 Amalgamated 18/01/2006 - U51909WB2006PTC107335 SAROJ COMMOTRADE PVT LTD 13684000.0 Amalgamated 18/01/2006 - U70200WB2009PTC135082 SAROJ INFRACON PRIVATE LIMITED 19575000.0 Amalgamated 25/10/2012 - U72900WB2006PTC107372 QUANTTA ANALYTICS PRIVATE LIMITED 40571000.0 Active 18/01/2006 - U74140NL2011PTC008313 SAROJ SUNRISE PRIVATE LIMITED 9050000.0 Active 23/03/2016 - U74900WB2011PTC200467 SAROJ HORIZON PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Amalgamated 23/12/2011 - U74999WB2017NPL219082 NATURAL ELEMENTS FOUNDATION 0.0 Active 25/01/2017 - -
Associated with Directors
BINOD KUMAR BAWRI Director LAXMI NARAYAN SHARMA Director VINAY BAWRI Director PRADIP BANSAL Director