RISHI KUMAR ACHARYA
-
About RISHI KUMAR ACHARYA,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U51101WB2009PTC133779 CAPRICORN SUPPLIERS PRIVATE LIMITED 995000.0 Active 08/05/2014 - U51101WB2010PTC146850 CRAZY COMMOSALES PRIVATE LIMITED 350000.0 Active 06/04/2017 - U51101WB2010PTC147000 SUNFLOWER COMMODEAL PRIVATE LIMITED 350000.0 Active 06/04/2017 - U51909WB1996PTC080780 U NIK TRACOM PVT LTD 5527000.0 Active 01/09/2004 - U65923WB2008PTC122112 CASPER VINIMAY PRIVATE LIMITED 870000.0 Active 25/01/2008 - U67120WB2006PTC108946 NEOWORTH SECURITIES PVT LTD 1108550.0 Active 17/04/2006 - U70109WB1948PTC016219 SRI GANESH PROPERTIES PVT LTD 500000.0 Active 30/08/2000 - U74999WB2006PTC108931 NEOWORTH COMMODITIES PVT LTD 4100000.0 Active 12/04/2006 - -
Associated with Directors
SHREYA ACHARYA Director CHANDA PUROHIT DEVI Director SANJAY SARAF Director RAVI KANT JAJODIA Director