RAM NIRANJAN SHARMA
-
About RAM NIRANJAN SHARMA,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U51909AS2011PTC010468 SIDDHI VINAYAK IRON & STEEL PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 29/03/2011 - U51909WB2010PTC140868 ASCENT DEALER PRIVATE LIMITED 1780000.0 Active 11/01/2010 - U51909WB2012PTC174401 LANKESHWAR VINIMAY PRIVATE LIMITED 4100000.0 Active 17/02/2012 - U51909WB2012PTC174407 TAPASAVEE TRADE PRIVATE LIMITED 5500000.0 Active 18/02/2012 - U51909WB2012PTC174409 RAGHUBAR TRADECOM PRIVATE LIMITED 154100.0 Active 03/03/2016 - -
Associated with Directors
OM PRAKASH SHARMA Director PRAVIN KUMAR CHAND Director DHANARAJ Director SANJAY KUMAR BEEL Director