RAKESH JALAN
-
About RAKESH JALAN,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U36900WB2003PLC097151 FAST COMMODITY MARKETS LIMITED 17500000.0 Active 21/10/2003 - U65999WB1993PTC060744 LUCK LUCK INVESTMENT & FINANCE PVT LTD 2500000.0 Active 12/02/2007 - U67120WB1994PTC064332 SAND DUNE TRADE PVT.LTD. 2000000.0 Active 09/08/1994 - U67120WB1995PTC072181 FURPINE INTRADE PVT.LTD. 5000000.0 Active 19/06/1995 - U67120WB1998PTC087489 ONLINE SHARE BROKING SERVICES PRIVATE LIMITED 400000.0 Active 10/01/2018 - -
Associated with Directors
MANOJ KUMAR MOHNOT Director BINAY KUMAR AGARWAL Director ALOKE SARAOGI Director MEENA AGARWAL Director