RAJEEV AGARWAL
-
About RAJEEV AGARWAL,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U15115AS2018PTC018363 FARMGRAM FOODBEV PRIVATE LIMITED 60000.0 Active 23/02/2018 - U23109AS1999PLC005750 S M COKES LIMITED 25957000.0 Active 05/01/2015 - U23209ML2004PTC007399 MEGHALAYA BITCHEM PRIVATE LIMITED 27560000.0 Active 29/04/2004 - U27104AS1996PLC004876 BITCHEM ASPHALT TECHNOLOGIES LIMITED 5715000.0 Active 01/11/2010 - U27105ML2003PTC007234 DYNA ROOF PRIVATE LIMITED 10919060.0 Active 17/10/2003 - U40101AS2010PLC009973 SM ENERGENCO LIMITED 39450000.0 Active 30/07/2012 - U45203AS2010PLC010103 SM ENGINEERS INDIA LIMITED 2700000.0 Active 30/07/2012 - U65100AS2011PTC010355 SM SONS HOLDINGS PRIVATE LIMITED 147200000.0 Active 30/09/2013 - U65921AS1997PTC005180 VICTORY CONSULTANTS PRIVATE LIMITED 367000.0 Active 25/02/2016 -