RAKESH SHARMA
-
About RAKESH SHARMA,
Director -
Associated with Companies
CIN Company Name Paid Up Capital Company Status Appointment Date Resignation Date U70101DL2010PTC201812 COLORFUL ESTATES PRIVATE LIMITED 10000000.0 Active 03/06/2010 - U70101DL2012PTC233119 ADMIRE ESTATES PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 17/04/2012 - U70102DL2007PTC163811 IDEAL INFRAPROMOTERS PRIVATE LIMITED 9203000.0 Active 23/05/2007 - U70102DL2010PTC197686 SPOORTY DEVELOPERS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 06/03/2010 - U70102DL2011PTC212121 SABHYATA DEVELOPERS PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 16/01/2012 - U70109DL2012PTC244552 CONTEND INFRASTRUCTURE PRIVATE LIMITED 100000.0 Active 27/06/2013 - U70200DL2012PTC233221 PRAISE CONSTRUCTION PRIVATE LIMITED 30000000.0 Active 17/04/2012 - U70209DL1996PTC079125 J.C. DEVELOPERS PRIVATE LIMITED 500000.0 Active 27/07/2002 -